Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Conway, Montgomery, Young, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in the nontherapeutic use of medically important antimicrobial drugs in specified cattle, swine, and poultry on or after October 1, 2016; requiring a specified farm operation to submit specified information under specified circumstances to the Department of Agriculture on or before October 1 each year, beginning on or before October 1, 2017; authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture to impose a specified penalty; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0701
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414435/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414435/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414435/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {323029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {613527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {403226/1 Adopted (31-14)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Middleton)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {414435/1 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {414435/1 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {414435/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {323029/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {613527/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {403226/1 Adopted (31-14) 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Middleton) 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 47
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky) 47A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 through 3-1005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM