Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Report
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Currie, Edwards, Guzzone, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Peters, Ramirez, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Transportation, to submit to the Senate Budget and Taxation Committee and the House Appropriations Committee by January 1, 2020, a report outlining a certain plan and identifying certain information.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0523
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {397271/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-11)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Report
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay Rates
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {397271/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Text - Third - State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Report
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (129-11) 70
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Report
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM