Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Electronic Bingo and Tip Jars - Distribution to Maryland State Arts Council
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Beidle, Carter, Elfreth, Griffith, Hayes, Pinsky, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning in fiscal year 2021 and each fiscal year thereafter, that the distribution of revenue from the State admissions and amusement tax on electronic bingo and electronic tip jars to the Maryland State Arts Council be $1,000,000 each fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0135
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Electronic Bingo and Tip Jars - Distribution to Maryland State Arts Council
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 4:38 PM