Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0465 - 2020RS
   CH0014 - 2021RS
Title
Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program and Admissions and Amusement Tax Distributions – Extensions and Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Beidle, Carter, Elfreth, Griffith, Hayes, Pinsky, Washington, West, Young, Zucker, Miller, Feldman, King, Klausmeier, Peters, Rosapepe, Edwards, Serafini, Salling, and Eckardt
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 14 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending and altering through fiscal year 2026 the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an amount that when combined with the amount estimated to be distributed to the E-Nnovation Initiative Fund under certain provisions of law equals at least $8,500,000; altering certain requirements for certain individuals in certain positions funded by certain endowment proceeds; altering the distribution of certain revenue; providing certain contingencies; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0135
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 4 and Sec. 5 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {219838/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {525968/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Overridden (30-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Overridden (104-30)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 14 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Electronic Bingo and Tip Jars - Distribution to Maryland State Arts Council
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {219838/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program and Admissions and Amusement Tax Distributions – Extensions and Alterations
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Ways and Means 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {525968/1 Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program and Admissions and Amusement Tax Distributions – Extensions and Alterations
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/15 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Overridden (30-15)
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Overridden (104-30)
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 14 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program and Admissions and Amusement Tax Distributions – Extensions and Alterations
(   6-604, 6-612, 6-614, 6-618 )
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page