Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps Instructors
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying to Baltimore County a definition of "public school employee" that includes Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps (JROTC) instructors for the purpose of specified provisions of law related to organizations of certificated employees.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0895
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM