Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Glassman and Middleton
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund annual report to include information on each award recipient's employer, a specified summary of award recipients' research results and accomplishments, and specified award tracking information; requiring that a summary of research results and accomplishments meet specified disclosure standards under specified circumstances; and authorizing a summary of research results and accomplishments to exclude specified information.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0368 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {127674/1
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {127674/1
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {127674/1 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 26
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {127674/1 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Committee Amendment Adopted 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Senate 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 30
House 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 33
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-429, 10-442 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM