Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Sydnor, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the membership of the State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services to include two additional members from the Department of Juvenile Services.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0872
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable Adopted 33
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Second Reading Passed 33
Text - Third - State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 10:52 AM