Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Shank, Benson, Brinkley, Colburn, Getty, Jacobs, Jennings, and Jones-Rodwell
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified law enforcement agency to report, on an annual basis, specified information about each individual seizure and forfeiture completed by the agency under State or federal forfeiture law; authorizing the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center (MSAC) to require a law enforcement agency to provide relevant information not specified in the Act; requiring a specified law enforcement agency to file a specified report for the agency and the corresponding prosecutor's office with the MSAC; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM