Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals to certify to the Governor for inclusion without revision in each State budget a specified appropriation to provide legal representation to income-eligible parties in protective order proceedings; establishing a Judicare Pilot Program to provide legal representation to income-eligible parents in contested custody and visitation proceedings in specified jurisdictions; providing for funding for the pilot program; establishing a workgroup to monitor implementation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0348
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-512.2, 9-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM