Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Muse, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of counties and municipalities in the State to use speed monitoring systems to enforce highway speed laws; repealing the authority to use work zone speed control systems to enforce highway speed laws within work zones; repealing the authority to use traffic control signal monitoring systems to enforce traffic control signal laws; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0436
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2016 3/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-202.1, 21-809, 21-810 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM