Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Prison Artists Marketplace Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Bates, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish the Prison Artists Marketplace Program; specifying that the purpose of the Program is to display and sell artistic works created by inmates during a term of incarceration; requiring that the artistic works be sold at a marketplace at Druid Hill Park in Baltimore City; requiring a specified distribution of the proceeds from the sale of artistic works; stating it is the intent of the General Assembly to employ inmates who are eligible for work release; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0944
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Services - Prison Artists Marketplace Program - Establishment
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM