Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0472


CH0559

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominium Associations and Homeowners Associations – Adopted Annual Budget – Submission to Unit Owners and Lot Owners
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 559
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the council of unit owners or other governing body of a condominium association to submit the adopted annual budget to the unit owners not more than 30 days after the meeting at which the budget was adopted; authorizing the adopted annual budget to be submitted to each unit owner by electronic transmission, by posting on the condominium association's home page, or by inclusion in the homeowners association's newsletter; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0745 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {128079/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-3)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 559
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Homeowners Associations - Adopted Annual Budget - Submission to Lot Owners
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments {128079/1 Adopted 33
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - Condominium Associations and Homeowners Associations – Adopted Annual Budget – Submission to Unit Owners and Lot Owners
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 36
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-3) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 559
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/16/2020 2:07 PM