Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Districts – Legislative Districting Plan References
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Updating certain provisions of law regarding Baltimore City alcoholic beverages districts to refer to the Legislative Districting Plan of 2012 rather than the corresponding plan of 2002; requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to grant a certain exemption to certain persons under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0506
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Districts – Legislative Districting Plan References
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {764931/1 Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Districts – Legislative Districting Plan References
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page