Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to obtain specified census data, adjust the census data for specified purposes, and provide the census data to a temporary redistricting commission within 30 days after the Department has finished adjusting the census data; creating a temporary redistricting commission; requiring the commission to use specified census data to prepare and adopt a districting plan for congressional districting within a specified time period; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0814 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/03/2016 Text - First - Congressional Districting Process
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6A-01 through 8-6A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM