Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Robinson, Serafini, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Cigarette Restitution Fund to include a separate account to be used for substance use treatment, with priority given to residential treatment services, recovery support housing, and specified crisis response services, and for rate adjustments for specified agencies or programs; requiring specified distributions from the account to be used to supplement and not supplant specified other funds; prohibiting more than $10,000,000 from being appropriated from the account in any fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0541
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1144 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Text - First - Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM