Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in electric drive vehicle in a parking space that is designated for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles; requiring that a parking space for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles have certain pavement markings; requiring that a parking space for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles be counted as part of the overall number of parking spaces for certain purposes; establishing a civil penalty of $50 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0316 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-145.1, 21-1003.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:07 PM