Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsored by
Senators Jacobs, Glassman, and Jennings
Status
In the House - First Reading Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the State's Attorney for Harford County.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
38
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 33
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 38
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM