Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Limited Immunity - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Medical Emergencies
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a person who, in good faith, seeks, provides, or assists with medical assistance for a person experiencing a medical emergency after ingesting or using alcohol or drugs, or the person is experiencing the medical emergency after ingesting or using alcohol or drugs, shall be immune from specified criminal prosecutions if evidence for the criminal prosecutions was obtained solely as a result of specified actions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0342
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {548473/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {548473/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Judiciary 46
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM