Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for law enforcement officers to include law enforcement officers who are members of the Maryland Transportation Authority Police and reside in a political subdivision in which the crime rate exceeds the State's crime rate; and applying the Act to all taxable years after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0387
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1261 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (135-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (135-0) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM