Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Klausmeier, Beidle, and Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the name of the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education to be the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program; authorizing food service facilities under the Program to store and make available for administration auto-injectable epinephrine for individuals who are experiencing or are believed to be experiencing anaphylaxis when a physician or emergency medical services are not immediately available; altering the purpose of the Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1462
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 11:22 AM