Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Klausmeier, Beidle, and Hershey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the name of the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education to be the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program; authorizing food service facilities under the Program to store and make available for administration auto-injectable epinephrine for individuals who are experiencing or are believed to be experiencing anaphylaxis when a physician or emergency medical services are not immediately available; altering the purpose of the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1462
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
(   13-7A-01 through 13-7A-04, 13-7A-05, 13-7A-06, 13-7A-07 through 13-7A-09 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page