Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact Statements
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Montgomery, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a fiscal note for a bill to include a criminal justice policy impact statement if the bill creates a criminal offense, significantly alters the elements of an existing criminal offense, alters the penalties applicable to a criminal offense, or changes existing sentencing, parole, or probation procedures; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to prepare the criminal justice policy impact statement by requesting information from specified entities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0678
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM