Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings Plan
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Bates, Ready, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified local employer contributions for members of the Teachers' Pension System; establishing a guaranteed retirement income plan and a retirement savings plan under the State Retirement and Pension System; requiring that members of the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System elect to become members of the guaranteed retirement income plan or the retirement savings plan by June 15, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1064
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1344 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings Plan
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-101, 21-304, 23-203, 23-204, 23-208, 30-302, 33-101 through 33-403, 33A-101 through 33A-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM