Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating certain findings of the General Assembly; prohibiting the State or any local jurisdiction from entering into agreements facilitating immigration-related detention by private entities; prohibiting governmental entities from approving zoning variances or permits for the construction or reuse of buildings to house immigration-related detainees; requiring governmental entities to terminate existing contracts for the detention of immigration-related detainees not later than October 1, 2022; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0016
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0850 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Services – Immigration Detention – Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/16/2021 12:43 PM
Click to return on the top page