Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain prohibition to prohibit a person from storing or leaving a firearm in a location where a minor could gain access to the firearm; altering a certain exception to the prohibition; establishing certain exceptions to the prohibition; prohibiting a person from storing or leaving a firearm in a location where an unsupervised minor could gain access to the firearm and an unsupervised minor does gain access to the firearm and the firearm causes harm to the minor or another person; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0200
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 2/17/2021 4:02 PM
Click to return on the top page