Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsored by
Senators Gladden and Forehand
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of criminal records if the person was found not criminally responsible under any State or local law that prohibits specified acts; specifying that a petition for expungement based on a finding of not criminally responsible under the Act may not be filed within a specified period of time; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0854
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458274/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (24-22)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {458274/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (24-22) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM