Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Board Structure
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Colburn, Kittleman, Robey, Currie, Middleton, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Mathias, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, to the extent practicable, that the Board for the Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company reflect the geographic and demographic, including race and gender, diversity of the State, and that at least one member shall have significant experience in the accounting or auditing field; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0341
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {287571/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733691/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {287571/1 Report Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 36
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {733691/1 Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Passed Enrolled 59
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM