Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Bates, Klausmeier, and Middleton
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority to collect an assessment or a charge not exceeding 5 cents per ticket under specified circumstances; specifying the circumstances under which the Authority may collect an assessment or a charge; and providing for an exception to a specified limitation regarding sources of operational funding for the Authority.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0696
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Second Reading Passed 27
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 29
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 31
House 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 58
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM