Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 Years
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Colburn, DeGrange, Robey, Currie, and Montgomery
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual under the age of 21 years from playing a table game or video lottery terminal in a video lottery facility, or from entering or remaining in an area within a video lottery facility that is designated for table game or video lottery terminal activities; providing that violation of the Act is a Code violation and a civil offense; providing that a person who violates the Act shall be issued a citation; requiring that the citation contain specified information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0275
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0009 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {659331/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {659331/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 37
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-136, 10-137 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM