Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System Program
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Benson, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Program on community solar energy generating systems under the authority of the Public Service Commission; providing for the structure and operation of the Program, including the generation of electricity and allocation of costs to system subscribers; authorizing an electric company to submit a petition to own and operate a community solar energy generating system to the Commission; authorizing the Commission to approve a petition if the Commission makes a specified determination; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1087
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0786 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM