Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Raskin, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of law concerning equal pay for equal work to prohibit discrimination on the basis of sex or gender identity; prohibiting an employer from discriminating between employees by providing less favorable employment opportunities based on sex or gender identity; providing that specified provisions of the Act do not preclude an employee from demonstrating that an employer's reliance on a specified exception is a pretext for discrimination on the basis of sex or gender identity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1003
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957476/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Bates) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957476/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {193020/2
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (President) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {193020/2 Adopted (28-16)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Waugh) {703323/1 Rejected (13-33)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {173227/1
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Norman) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {173227/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) {717575/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {503728/1 Rejected (14-32)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-29)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {957476/1 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Laid Over (Senator Bates) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {957476/1 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {193020/2 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Special Order until later today (President) Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {193020/2 Adopted (28-16) 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Waugh) {703323/1 Rejected (13-33) 50
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {173227/1 50
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Norman) Adopted 50
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {173227/1 Withdrawn 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) {717575/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {503728/1 Rejected (14-32) 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
House 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (106-29) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-301, 3-304, 3-304.1, 3-306, 3-307, 3-308 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM