Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Feldman, and King
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified nursing homes to assign to an appropriate committee the task of conducting an annual assessment of workplace safety issues and making recommendations; requiring the committee to consult specified employees of the nursing home; requiring a specified health care facility to establish a workplace safety committee; requiring a workplace safety committee to establish a workplace safety program including specified components; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0710
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277676/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {277676/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1410.2 )
(   5-1101 through 5-1103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM