Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Peters, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance; providing for the composition, chair and staffing of the Task Force; providing that the purpose of the Task Force is to make recommendations regarding the development of a State social insurance program that provides short-term benefits to eligible employees who lose wages due to specified circumstances; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0740
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {347677/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-39)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {347677/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 51
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (94-39) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM