Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Maryland Early Literacy Initiative Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Early Literacy Initiative Program to assist up to 50 qualifying schools to implement an evidence-based literacy program in the school to work with participating students to meet literacy proficiency targets by the end of third grade; requiring the Program to be established in at least three counties; requiring the State Department of Education to develop and administer the Program; authorizing a county board to apply to the Department for grants; terminating the Act after December 31, 2024; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Maryland Early Literacy Initiative Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Maryland Early Literacy Initiative Program - Established
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM