Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Endow Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Manno and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for 25% of the amount of a donation to a qualified permanent endowment fund at an eligible community foundation; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to report to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation and the Comptroller, on or before January 31 of each taxable year, the donations that the Department has approved for tax credit certificates during the prior year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0450
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {349534/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-13)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {349534/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/20/2014 3/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (120-13) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-204, 10-305, 10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM