Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Sponsored by
Senators Serafini, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, and Ready
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a cash balance plan under the State Retirement and Pension System; requiring that individuals who on June 30, 2018, are members of specified pension systems become members of the cash balance plan on July 1, 2018; requiring that individuals who are employed on or after July 1, 2018, by participating employers become members of the cash balance plan; requiring the Board of Trustees of the State Retirement and Pension System to administer the cash balance plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1072
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1317 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Employees and Teachers - Cash Balance Plan
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-304, 23-203, 23-204, 23-208, 30-302, 33-101 through 33-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM