Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of Income
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Robey, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the housing policy of the State regarding the provision of fair housing to include providing for fair housing regardless of source of income; prohibiting specified discriminatory acts based on a person's source of income; establishing specified qualifications and limitations on the general prohibition against discrimination in housing based on source of income; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0603
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0277 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {598278/1
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {598278/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (27-18)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)
Proceedings
54
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {598278/1 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted 51
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments {598278/1 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Brochin) Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (27-18) 53
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments 54
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22) 54
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1103, 20-701, 20-702, 20-704, 20-705, 20-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM