Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 811
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring the County Executive for Prince George's County, instead of the Governor, to appoint members to the Board of License Commissioners for the County; requiring the appointments to be made subject to confirmation by the Senate; requiring a hearing before the Prince George's County Senate Delegation to be held within 60 days after the nomination; requiring the County Executive, when evaluating an applicant, to consider the need for geographic, political, racial, ethnic, and gender diversity on the Board; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763094/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-39)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Young and Bates)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Young and Bates)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Davis, Fennell and Valderrama)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Davis, Fennell and Valderrama)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {233925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {233925/1
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Conference Committee Report {233925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 811
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Second Reading Passed 37
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 39
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Referred Economic Matters 41
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Favorable with Amendments {763094/1 Adopted 53
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Third Reading Passed (100-39) 54
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Young and Bates) 55
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Senate Requests House Recede 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Young and Bates) 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 House Refuses Recede 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Davis, Fennell and Valderrama) 63
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 House Refuses Recede 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Davis, Fennell and Valderrama) 59
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Conference Committee Report {233925/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Conference Committee Report {233925/1 67
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Davis) Adopted 67
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Conference Committee Report {233925/1 Adopted 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-3) 68
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 811
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-102, 26-202 through 26-206, 26-206.1, 26-209 )
(   2-1220, 2-1223, 2-1224 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM