Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms
Sponsored by
Senators King, Feldman, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Raskin, Currie, Guzzone, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms; requiring the Interagency Committee on Public School Construction to implement and administer the Program; specifying requirements for grants awarded under the Program; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2016, to provide $20,000,000 in the State budget for the Program each fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0923
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {479336/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Saab) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-13)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments {479336/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/07/2015 4/07/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Special Order until next session (Delegate Saab) Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (125-13) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM