Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from using a scanning device to scan or swipe an individual's identification card or a driver's license to obtain personal information; prohibiting a person from retaining, selling, or transferring any information collected from scanning or swiping an individual's identification card or driver's license; providing that nothing in the Act prohibits a law enforcement officer from using a scanning device to record, retain, or transmit information if acting within the scope of the officer's official duties; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1047 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {657075/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {783228/2 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {657075/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {783228/2 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Economic Matters 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   13-301, 14-1327 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page