Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing in specified jurisdictions a nonrefillable container permit; authorizing a permit holder to sell draft beer for off-premises consumption by packaging the beer in a nonrefillable container that meets specified standards; specifying requirements for permit holders, hours of sale, and permit fees; and prohibiting permit fees to be charged for a nonrefillable container permit if the applicant has a refillable container permit.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0292
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994136/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933393/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {994136/1 Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 43
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {933393/1 Adopted 62
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-102, 10-1101, 10-1103, 11-102, 11-1101, 11-1103.1, 12-102, 12-1101, 12-1102.1, 13-102, 13-1101, 13-1103, 14-102, 14-1101, 14-1103, 15-102, 15-1101, 15-1103, 16-102, 16-1101, 16-1103, 17-102, 17-1101, 17-1103, 18-102, 18-1101, 18-1103, 19-102, 19-1101, 19-1103, 20-102, 20-1101, 20-1106, 21-102, 21-1101, 21-1104.1, 22-102, 22-1101, 22-1104, 23-102, 23-1101, 23-1104, 25-102, 25-1101, 25-1104.1, 26-102, 26-1101, 26-1102.1, 27-102, 27-1101, 27-1103, 28-102, 28-1101, 28-1103, 31-102, 31-1101, 31-1102.1, 32-102, 32-1101, 32-1103, 33-102, 33-1101, 33-1104, 4-1106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM