Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works Project
Sponsored by
Senators King, Feldman, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in specified years not to exceed $350,000 each year, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Cornerstone Montgomery, Inc. and the Board of Directors of the Interfaith Works, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of #2 Taft Court facility and for the relocation of Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works facilities, located in Montgomery County; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0900
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015, June 1, 2016, June 1, 2017, June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM