Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Investment in Job Skills Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Peters, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Career and Technology Education Grant Program; authorizing, rather than requiring, the Governor to appropriate at least $3,000,000 in the annual budget for Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to create a statewide media campaign to promote participation in career and technical education, apprenticeships, and workforce development in workforce shortage occupations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Investment in Job Skills Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Investment in Job Skills Act of 2019
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 21
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1905.2, 18-3303, 5-324 )
(   10-742 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM