Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's Future
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Manno, Middleton, Montgomery, Pinsky, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Maryland's Future; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the chair of the Commission to call the first meeting of the Commission on or before June 30, 2014; authorizing the chair to call specified additional meetings; requiring the Commission to hold specified public hearings; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0738
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM