Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Conway, King, Madaleno, and Middleton
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to $4,000 the maximum amount of a State matching stipend awarded to certificated public school employees who teach in public schools that have comprehensive needs; requiring specified teachers in Anne Arundel County to receive a stipend to a maximum of $1,500 under specified circumstances; establishing the Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Pilot Program; authorizing each county board of education to choose to participate in the Program; requiring a county board to select teachers to participate in the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1410
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814736/1
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814736/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {545060/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-45)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {814736/1 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 37
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {814736/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 40
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 42
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {545060/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-45) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-117.1, 6-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM