Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workforce Data Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Peters, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the information that the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation requires to be included in unemployment insurance contribution and employment reports shall include, for each employee, occupation and job title, number of hours worked in a calendar quarter, and work location; and requiring that the location listed in a contribution and employment report under a certain provision of the Act be the employee's actual work site and not the employing unit's place of business.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1128
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workforce Data Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Workforce Data Act of 2019
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM