Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence - Duties
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Conway, Forehand, Garagiola, Jones-Rodwell, King, Madaleno, Montgomery, Muse, Middleton, Astle, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Ramirez, and Pipkin
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence to study and develop specified strategies and recommendations for advancing telemedicine technologies and use.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0937
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {247479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {247479/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 47
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM