Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Department of Planning - Name Correction
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting an outdated reference to the name of the Department of Planning in the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact by repealing a certain contingency.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0533
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/25/2018
Legislative Date
4/25/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Department of Planning - Name Correction
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Department of Planning - Name Correction
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/25/2018 4/25/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Text - Chapter - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Department of Planning - Name Correction
(   10-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page