Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Table Games - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Feldman, Gladden, Guzzone, Kelley, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from 80 to 70% the portion that a video lottery operation licensee shall retain of the table game proceeds at a video lottery facility; altering the percent of the proceeds at a video lottery facility that the Comptroller shall pay to the Education Trust Fund; and providing for the effective dates of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015, July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM