Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statewide Steering Committee on Services for Adults With Sickle Cell Disease - Infusion Center - Study
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Klausmeier, Lee, McFadden, Muse, Raskin, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Statewide Steering Committee on Services for Adults with Sickle Cell Disease to study adult sickle cell disease infusion center models, complete a cost-benefit analysis, and make specified recommendations regarding the establishment of an adult sickle cell disease infusion center; and requiring the Committee to submit an interim report by December 1, 2016, and a final report by December 1, 2017, to the Governor, the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities, and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM